Global Patent Index - EP 0759277 B1

EP 0759277 B1 2000-04-05 - Retaining device

Title (en)

Retaining device

Title (de)

Halteorgan

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue

Publication

EP 0759277 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111319 A

Priority

DE 29513389 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759277A1] A connecting tab is pivotably fitted at the free end of a first arm of the U-shaped clamp stirrup and comprises two arms directed towards each other angularly, of which one is formed as clamp arm, the length of which is greater than the distance between the two U-arms. The end of the other arm connected to the clamp arm is formed as a U-shaped spring clamp for suspension of an object. Out of the free end of the U-shaped spring clamp (30) is bent a counter hook formed by incision and which extends inwards between the two arms of the U-shaped spring clamp. The free end of the U-shaped spring clamp in the closed starts of the holding device (10) supports on the second arm (18) of the U-shaped clamp stirrup (12), which is longer than the first arm (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 21/00; A45F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 99/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29513389 U1 19951207; CN 1082799 C 20020417; CN 1167597 A 19971217; EP 0759277 A1 19970226; EP 0759277 B1 20000405; ES 2146813 T3 20000816; PT 759277 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160714

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160720

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160712

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-08-03 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160712

2016-07-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604871

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150708

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080713

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146813 T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. E. BONINI S.R.L.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604871 20000511

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970524

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT