Global Patent Index - EP 0759288 B1

EP 0759288 B1 2001-12-05 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR REFLEXOTHERAPY

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR REFLEXOTHERAPY

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT FÜR REFLEXOTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE POUR REFLEXOTHERAPIE

Publication

EP 0759288 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94913858 A

Priority

  • RU 9400088 W
  • RU 93027704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9427554A1] An electronic reflexotherapy device comprises a compact body (1) with a cover (3) and an insert (2) made of transparent material at the top. The body (1) houses an energy source (10), an optical indicator (9) and an electronic unit (8), provided additionally with an audio indicator device (11). At its forward end, the body (1) incorporates a stimulating metal end-piece (4) in the form of a bushing serving as a passive electrode (5), the lower part of which has an annular, cylindrical cavity (12). Located at the centre of the passive electrode (5) is an acicular active electrode, dielectrically insulated therefrom, the working end of which is hemispherical. The height of the annular cavity (12) is at least twice the diameter of the active electrode (6). The active and inert electrodes form part of the electronic actuating system for the electronic unit (8) and automatically switch on the device on contact through the skin. The device of the invention can be used in searching for acupuncture points, marking them and performing therapy automatically while carrying out an express diagnosis by electro-acupuncture methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 39/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9427554 A1 19941208; DE 69429367 D1 20020117; DE 69429367 T2 20020814; EP 0759288 A1 19970226; EP 0759288 A4 19970129; EP 0759288 B1 20011205; RU 2070025 C1 19961210

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69429367

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69429367

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090425

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429367 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990225

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951216

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-01-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB