Global Patent Index - EP 0759357 B1

EP 0759357 B1 2000-05-03 - Method and machine for making window envelopes around a document

Title (en)

Method and machine for making window envelopes around a document

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Fensterbriefumschläge um ein Dokumente

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la préparation d'enveloppes à fenêtre autour de documents

Publication

EP 0759357 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95490024 A

Priority

EP 95490024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759357A1] The envelope blank (6) is taken from an opaque band by cutting along lines (6A) perpendicular to its edges (1C,1D) to form a series of identical modules (6B). Each envelope is made by folding flaps (5) of the blank along lines (5A) parallel to opposite sides of the document (2). An imprint and a window (4) are made on one of the external and internal faces. The longitudinal position of an index (8) is defined and memorised relative to one of the longitudinal and transverse positions of the impression and window. Then the impression is made on one of the band faces (1A,1B), sequentially on each module. The index is marked on each different module along a longitudinal step (P1) equal to the spacing (E) of the cutting lines . Finally the position of the index is detected and relative to it a cut (4A) for each window is made followed by fitting of the screen (4B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/00; B31B 1/24; B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/00 (2006.01); B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2013.01); B31B 2219/9038 (2013.01); B31B 2221/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0759357 A1 19970226; EP 0759357 B1 20000503; DE 69516684 D1 20000608; DE 69516684 T2 20001214; ES 2146732 T3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030825

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOPAPROFIPAP S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030823

2002-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020806

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146732

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-28 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER (B DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SOPAPROFIPAP, S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP4

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516684

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980511

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970303

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL