Global Patent Index - EP 0759398 B1

EP 0759398 B1 2000-05-24 - Hand-labeler

Title (en)

Hand-labeler

Title (de)

Handetikettiergerät

Title (fr)

Etiqueteuse à main

Publication

EP 0759398 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102273 A

Priority

JP 21449595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759398A1] A hand-labeler for removing labels from a label-carrying tape and putting each label on an object is described. In order to enable using even the knife-cut type label-carrying tape by detecting surely a front end of coming label, the labeler has a pillow-shaped projection (44a) on an upper guide surface of label peeling guide member (44) at a front side of a tape press plate (42) across the surface to bent the label-carrying tape and cause at least a gap at a cut line between going label and coming label on the pillow-shaped projection so that allows the feeler to (46) detect the front end of the coming label. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 11/00; B65C 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/18 (2006.01); B65C 9/00 (2006.01); B65C 9/42 (2006.01); B65C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/0006 (2013.01); B65C 9/42 (2013.01); B65C 11/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0759398 A1 19970226; EP 0759398 B1 20000524; DE 69608509 D1 20000629; DE 69608509 T2 20000921; JP H0958643 A 19970304

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608509

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120215

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110307

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608509 20000629

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980424

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970514

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT