Global Patent Index - EP 0759580 B1

EP 0759580 B1 2000-11-15 - Multiactive electrostatographic elements having a support with beads protruding on one surface

Title (en)

Multiactive electrostatographic elements having a support with beads protruding on one surface

Title (de)

Multiaktive elektrophotographische Elemente enthaltend ein Substrat dass an einer Oberfläche hervertretende Partikel enthält

Title (fr)

Eléments electrophotographiques multiactifs comprenant un substrate ayant des particules formant des protubérances sur une surface

Publication

EP 0759580 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202311 A

Priority

  • US 265195 P
  • US 58532696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759580A1] A method of making a multiactive photoconductive elements is disclosed. The method uses a knurl-free planar polymeric support having beads protruding from one surface. An element comprising such supports is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/10; G03G 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/00 (2006.01); G03G 5/02 (2006.01); G03G 5/05 (2006.01); G03G 5/082 (2006.01); G03G 5/10 (2006.01); G03G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/10 (2013.01); G03G 5/02 (2013.01); G03G 5/0525 (2013.01); G03G 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DATABASE WPI Week 9117, 19 March 1991 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 91-122661, FUJI XEROX

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0759580 A1 19970226; EP 0759580 B1 20001115; DE 69610955 D1 20001221; DE 69610955 T2 20010503; JP H09106083 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060819

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060819

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610955 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980504

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB