Global patent index - EP 0759581 B1

EP 0759581 B1 2000-11-15 - Multiactive electrostatographic elements having a support with beads protruding on one surface

Title (en)

Multiactive electrostatographic elements having a support with beads protruding on one surface

Title (de)

Multiaktive elektrophotographische Elemente, die einen Träger enthalten der Partikel enthält, die an der Oberfläche hervortreten

Title (fr)

Eléments électrophotographiques multiactifs comprenant un substrate ayant des particules formant des protubérances sur une surface

Publication

EP 0759581 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202312 A

Priority

  • US 265995 P
  • US 58513096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759581A1] A method of making a multiactive photoconductive elements is disclosed. The method uses a knurl-free planar polymeric support having beads protruding from one surface. An element comprising such supports is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/10; G03G 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/00 (2006.01); G03G 5/10 (2006.01); G03G 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/14 (2013.01); G03G 5/10 (2013.01); G03G 5/102 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DATABASE WPI Week 9117, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 91-122661

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0759581 A1 19970226; EP 0759581 B1 20001115; DE 69610956 D1 20001221; DE 69610956 T2 20010503; JP H09106082 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060819

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060819

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610956

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980504

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB