Global Patent Index - EP 0759584 B1

EP 0759584 B1 2001-01-31 - Synchronisation device for an electronic timepiece

Title (en)

Synchronisation device for an electronic timepiece

Title (de)

Synchronisationsvorrichtung für eine elektronische Uhr

Title (fr)

Dispositif de synchronisation pour pièce d'horlogerie électronique

Publication

EP 0759584 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96113121 A

Priority

CH 239395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0759584A1] The contact wheel, driven by the hour wheel of the movement, carries an axisymmetric central contact spring with four arms (4,6,8,10) touching conductive tracks (T1-T5) on a printed circuit board. The geometry of the arms ensures a periodic variation of the interconnections between the tracks. Three tracks (T1-T3) subtending equal angles of about 50 degrees at the centre are distributed uniformly around one half of the ring. Three pairs of tracks (T4,T5) individually subtending about 20 degrees are arranged around the other half. An electronic control signal processor memorises the contact configuration in the initial position, and detects any one-hour movement of the wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/00; G04G 9/00; H01H 19/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 9/00 (2006.01); G04G 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/12 (2006.01); H01H 19/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/585 (2013.01); G04C 3/005 (2013.01); G04G 9/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0759584 A1 19970226; EP 0759584 B1 20010131; CH 688950 B5 19981231; CH 688950G A3 19980630; CN 1095102 C 20021127; CN 1152139 A 19970618; DE 69611709 D1 20010308; DE 69611709 T2 20010816; HK 1012443 A1 20011005; JP H09119990 A 19970506; SG 64401 A1 19990427; TW 308655 B 19970621; US 5734626 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69611709

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611709 20010308

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYNCHRONISATION DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE

2000-05-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYNCHRONISATION DEVICE FOR AN ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SYNCHRONISATION MEANS OF DISPLAYED TIME INFORMATION, ESPECIALLY RELATED TO TIME ZONE CHANGES

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980527

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT