Global Patent Index - EP 0759795 B1

EP 0759795 B1 2000-02-09 - INSTALLATION FOR FIRE FIGHTING

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR FIRE FIGHTING

Title (de)

FEUERLÖSCHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION D'EXTINCTION D'INCENDIES

Publication

EP 0759795 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95918009 A

Priority

  • FI 9500258 W
  • FI 942299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5871055A] PCT No. PCT/FI95/00258 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 25, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 25, 1996 PCT Filed May 16, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/31254 PCT Pub. Date Nov. 23, 1995The invention relates to an installation for fire fighting, using a number of automatically released sprinklers. The invention also relates to a sprinkler to be used in the installation. With the aim of conserving extinguishing liquid, reducing the size of the drive unit of the installation intended for the procedure and providing an active installation that is released directly by a sprinkler, the installation comprises a number of electric positive and negative wires, which have been arranged to a scanning device comprising breakers (+A-+E, -13, --19) for each positive and negative wire, whereby said wires form an electric net where positive and negative wires are electrically connected via sprinklers respectively comprising individual breakers (K), whereby each sprinkler is arranged to open its breaker (K) upon the release the sprinkler in question and to thus interrupt the connection between the respective positive and negative wire, whereby the scanning device, upon establishing the interrupted connection and the position of the released sprinkler, is arranged to release according to a plan the sprinklers adjacent to said position by closing according to said plan the breakers (+A-+E, -13, --19) of the scanning device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 37/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 37/40 (2006.01); A62C 31/05 (2006.01); B05B 1/14 (2006.01); B05B 1/26 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); B05B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/05 (2013.01); B05B 1/14 (2013.01); B05B 1/262 (2013.01); B05B 1/3447 (2013.01); B05B 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5871055 A 19990216; AU 2411095 A 19951205; AU 696189 B2 19980903; CA 2186843 A1 19951123; CA 2186843 C 20060124; DE 69515031 D1 20000316; DE 69515031 T2 20000629; EP 0759795 A1 19970305; EP 0759795 B1 20000209; FI 942299 A0 19940517; FI 942299 A 19951118; FI 96483 B 19960329; FI 96483 C 19960710; JP H10500045 A 19980106; WO 9531254 A1 19951123

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110516

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110516

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110516

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69515031

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515031 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 62C 37/40 A

1999-08-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INSTALLATION FOR FIRE FIGHTING

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990225

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961026

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT