Global Patent Index - EP 0759812 B1

EP 0759812 B1 2000-01-26 - PRECISION COATING PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMERIZABLE FILMS

Title (en)

PRECISION COATING PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYMERIZABLE FILMS

Title (de)

PRÄZISIONSBESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG POLYMERISIERBARER DÜNNSCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ENDUCTION DE PRECISION DESTINE A LA PREPARATION DE FILMS POLYMERISABLES

Publication

EP 0759812 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95917560 A

Priority

  • US 9504466 W
  • US 23542394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9529766A1] A method of coating the surface of a substrate with an essentially solvent-free polymerizable fluid that includes passing the fluid through a die onto the surface of the substrate as the substrate moves relative to the die. The die includes a channel adapted to receive the fluid and an adjustable width slot in communication with said channel through which the fluid is passed formed between a substantially straight, sharp edge located on the downstream side of the substrate and a land located on the upstream side of the substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9529766 A1 19951109; CA 2187896 A1 19951109; DE 69514795 D1 20000302; DE 69514795 T2 20000831; EP 0759812 A1 19970305; EP 0759812 B1 20000126; JP 3826184 B2 20060927; JP H10500057 A 19980106

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69514795

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080407

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514795 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961125

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT