Global patent index - EP 0759870 B1

EP 0759870 B1 2000-01-12 - GATE OPERATION CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

GATE OPERATION CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BEWEGUNG VON TÜREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE LA CINEMATIQUE DE PORTES

Publication

EP 0759870 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96906796 A

Priority

  • FR 9600358 W
  • FR 9503033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5809927A] PCT No. PCT/FR96/00358 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 14, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 14, 1996 PCT Filed Mar. 7, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/28342 PCT Pub. Date Sep. 9, 1996The invention relates to a device for controlling the kinematics of pivoting elements designed to open substantially simultaneously to allow a clear passage of a weapon in a weapon launch tube equipped with a weapon launch circuit via an air distributor on board a submarine. The invention includes on the axis of rotation of each pivoting element and on the axis of rotation of a rotary element connected to the air distributor, a mechanism for converting a rotation into a translation, a mechanism for converting a translation into a rotation, and an associated mechanism for quantifying these conversions. The mechanism for converting a translation into a rotation on the axis of rotation of the rotary element is activated by the mechanism for converting a rotation into a translation on the axis of rotation of each pivoting element in association with the quantification mechanisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63G 8/32; F41F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/32 (2006.01); F41F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41F 3/10 (2013.01); B63G 8/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5809927 A 19980922; DE 69606122 D1 20000217; DE 69606122 T2 20000531; EP 0759870 A1 19970305; EP 0759870 B1 20000112; ES 2141481 T3 20000316; FR 2731673 A1 19960920; FR 2731673 B1 19970530; RU 2153440 C2 20000727; WO 9628342 A1 19960919

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2016-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160427

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150307

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150307

2015-12-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150308

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150307

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141481

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961010

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE