Global Patent Index - EP 0760034 B1

EP 0760034 B1 2000-01-12 - ROADWAY BARRIER

Title (en)

ROADWAY BARRIER

Title (de)

ABSPERREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE BARRAGE

Publication

EP 0760034 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96905582 A

Priority

  • AT 9600052 W
  • AT 48695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5813796A] PCT No. PCT/AT96/00052 Sec. 371 Date Feb. 25, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Feb. 25, 1997 PCT Filed Mar. 19, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO96/29472 PCT Pub. Date Sep. 26, 1996A barrier for a roadway has an upright (1), a barrier arm (9) fitted on a horizontal drive spindle (2), a pivoting mechanism and a balancing spring (8) supporting the opening and closing movements of the barrier arm (9). The balancing spring (8) has an untensioned zero position (0) between the blocking position (S) and the open position (F) of the barrier arm (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/02 (2006.01); E01F 13/06 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/028 (2013.01); E01F 13/06 (2013.01); E05F 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5813796 A 19980929; AT 402311 B 19970425; AT A48695 A 19960815; DE 29620291 U1 19970507; DE 59604161 D1 20000217; DE 59610777 D1 20031120; DE 59610799 D1 20031204; EP 0760034 A1 19970305; EP 0760034 B1 20000112; EP 0937820 A2 19990825; EP 0937820 A3 20020213; EP 0937820 B1 20031029; EP 0937821 A2 19990825; EP 0937821 A3 20020213; EP 0937822 A2 19990825; EP 0937822 A3 20020213; EP 0937822 B1 20031015; WO 9629472 A2 19960926; WO 9629472 A3 19961031

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604161

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SKIDATA A.G.

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-07-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604161 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIDATA AG

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981119

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961121

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT BE DE FR GB IT