Global Patent Index - EP 0760246 B1

EP 0760246 B1 2001-05-16 - Part of a binding for ski, heel or front hold down element

Title (en)

Part of a binding for ski, heel or front hold down element

Title (de)

Bindungsteil für Ski, Fersenhalter oder Vorderbacken

Title (fr)

Partie de fixation pour ski, talonnière ou butée

Publication

EP 0760246 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810504 A

Priority

FR 9509806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760246A1] The fastening, either for the heel or toe of a ski boot, consists of a body (1) which can slide lengthwise on a support fixed to the ski and is equipped with a pressure spring (11) pressing against a fixed thrust member (19). The compression exerted by the pressure spring is indicated by means of an arm (24) linked kinematically to the thrust member (19) and extending upwards, its tip being visible through a window (24) in the top or side of the body (1) which has a marker adjacent to it. The fastening is also equipped with a lever (9) for opening it, with the lever covering the window and the marker when in its raised position. The thrust member (19) is made in the form of a lock which holds the body of the fastening onto the ski support (2), and has an intermediate element (13) between the thrust screw and lock, to which the arm (24) is attached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01); A63C 9/08 (2012.01); A63C 9/084 (2012.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0805 (2013.01); A63C 9/005 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01); A63C 9/0842 (2013.01); A63C 9/0847 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760246 A1 19970305; EP 0760246 B1 20010516; AT 201144 T 20010615; DE 69612799 D1 20010621; DE 69612799 T2 20010906; FR 2737667 A1 19970214; FR 2737667 B1 19971017; US 5879020 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040729

2003-07-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612799 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201144 T 20010615

2000-08-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PART OF A BINDING FOR SKI, HEEL OR FRONT HOLD DOWN ELEMENT

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970828

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI