Global Patent Index - EP 0760254 B1

EP 0760254 B1 2001-03-14 - Device for homogenising flowable materials

Title (en)

Device for homogenising flowable materials

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Homogenisieren fliessfähiger Stoffe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'homogénéisation de matériaux coulants

Publication

EP 0760254 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113419 A

Priority

  • DE 19531775 A
  • DE 19537303 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760254A1] The assembly, which homogenises liq. or flowing bulk solids, comprises: (a) a vessel (1); (b) a homogeniser unit (2) associated with the vessel (1), and incorporating an inlet (2) for the substances which are to be processed (21); (c) an outlet (22) emerging from the homogeniser (2); (d) a spring-valve controlled first pipe (6) between the vessel (1) and the outlet (22), by means of which the materials discharged from the outlet (22) are returned to a zone within the vessel (1) which is remote from the homogeniser (2); and (e) a second pipe (24) between the outlet (22) and the vessel (1), by means of which materials discharged from the outlet (22) are returned to a zone within the vessel (1) which is closer to the homogeniser (2) than the outlet from the first (6) pipe. The second pipe (24) incorporates a pressure-operated value (25,26) and the valve to the second pipe (24) opens when the pressure at the discharge (22) exceeds a given threshold, and closes again when the pressure drops below a given threshold. The valve (25,26) is moved by a spring, under tension in the closed condition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16; B01F 7/00; F16J 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/10 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/163 (2013.01); B01F 5/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760254 A1 19970305; EP 0760254 B1 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-08-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59606576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NETZSCH VAKUMIX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2015-07-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NETZSCH VAKUMIX GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59606576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110821

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110821

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110821

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000804

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970417

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI