Global Patent Index - EP 0760257 B1

EP 0760257 B1 2000-05-17 - Shearing device for different kinds of bodies

Title (en)

Shearing device for different kinds of bodies

Title (de)

Schervorrichtung für verschiedenartige Körper

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour cisailler des corps de différente nature

Publication

EP 0760257 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401735 A

Priority

FR 9510109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760257A1] The shredder consists of a housing (1) containing at least one rotary shaft (3) with its axis (7) set at a given distance from the housing wall (19). The shaft carries one or more shredding discs (8) with spacer rings (9), and there is a scraper plate (20), generally triangular in shape, between the spacer ring and housing wall. The scraper plate has a concave recess (21) of the same radius as the spacer ring and lying coaxially with it, and is made of first (34) and second (36) sectors separated by an imaginary plane passing through the axis of the recess and spacer ring and intersecting the side of the triangle situated opposite the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/18; B02C 18/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/182 (2013.01); B02C 18/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760257 A1 19970305; EP 0760257 B1 20000517; DE 69608376 D1 20000621; DE 69608376 T2 20010104; FR 2737979 A1 19970228; FR 2737979 B1 19971107

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608376

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120806

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120806

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120806

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110804

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110801

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-12 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608376 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990730

1997-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970819

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI