Global patent index - EP 0760321 B1

EP 0760321 B1 2000-05-10 - Two-level coach with continuous circulation in the upper level and with access from a high platform

Title (en)

Two-level coach with continuous circulation in the upper level and with access from a high platform

Title (de)

Doppelstockwagen mit durchlaufender Begehbarkeit der oberen Etage und mit Zutritt von einem erhöhten Bahnsteig aus

Title (fr)

Voiture deux niveaux à circulation continue à l'étage supérieur et à accès à partir d'un quai haut

Publication

EP 0760321 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401870 A

Priority

FR 9510341 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760321A1] The carriage has an upper deck (1) to which access is gained from a high-level platform (8) through a door (3), the bottom of which is on a level with the platform. An intermediate landing (4) inside the door connects via stairs (5, 6) with both upper (1) and lower (2) decks. A second access door is located on the opposite side of the carriage to the first one and offset relative to it, so that each door is situated above one of the carriage bogies (14). The intermediate landing (4) has a depth which is less than the width of the carriage, and the space above the upper deck floor running the length of the stairwell is designed for equipment storage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760321 A1 19970305; EP 0760321 B1 20000510; CA 2184745 A1 19970305; CA 2184745 C 20040323; DE 69608190 D1 20000615; DE 69608190 T2 20001214; FR 2738208 A1 19970307; FR 2738208 B1 19971003; US 5644989 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69608190

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69608190

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608190

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-03-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608190

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2014-02-28 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALSTOM TRANSPORT TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20140217

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608190

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981203

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970715

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT