Global Patent Index - EP 0760405 B1

EP 0760405 B1 2000-03-29 - Shed forming device for looms

Title (en)

Shed forming device for looms

Title (de)

Fachbildeeinrichtung für Webmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de formation de foule pour métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 0760405 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113643 A

Priority

CH 246195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760405A1] In weaving shed forming appts., warp threads in heddles (7), each activated by a pneumatic or hydraulic piston-cylinder system (10), reciprocate between an upper and lower shed position. Also claimed is similar shed formation appts. where the pattern is electronically entered and the piston (11) or piston pair for each heddle is moved alternately by a pressurised medium in a direction corresp. to the heddle in the upper or lower shed position. Each heddle is formed as a piston rod emerging from the piston-cylinder system or is connected by rod-like means to the piston. The heddle free ends are led into drilled guide holes in a piston-rod guide block placed a distance from the system block (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 13/00; D03C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/34 (2006.01); D03C 3/22 (2006.01); D03C 3/44 (2006.01); D03C 5/00 (2006.01); D03C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/44 (2013.01); D03C 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760405 A1 19970305; EP 0760405 B1 20000329; CH 690037 A5 20000331; CZ 9602406 A3 19970312; DE 59604818 D1 20000504; JP H09111572 A 19970428; TR 9600687 A2 19970422; US 5762112 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MULLER AGM A.G.

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604818 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980723

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT