Global Patent Index - EP 0760419 B1

EP 0760419 B1 2001-04-11 - Method for surveying planned tunnel galleries

Title (en)

Method for surveying planned tunnel galleries

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erkunden von geplanten Tunnelstrecken

Title (fr)

Méthode pour relever une galerie tunnel planifiée

Publication

EP 0760419 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112725 A

Priority

DE 19532605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0760419A2] A through pilot bore is produced with a bore head guided in the bore path along the planned tunnel course. Samples are removed from the pilot bore for geo-physical examination. The pilot bore is produced along the centre line of the planned tunnel course. In the production of the pilot bore, bore advance parameters are highlighted, which can then be related to the bore hole investigation. One or more of the following bore advance parameters are established: bore pressure, advance speed, abrasion of the bore head. Samples are taken from the flushing back flow of the pilot boring. Pre-investigation is enacted by geo-physical depth probing of the surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/022; E21B 7/04; E21B 12/02; E21B 44/00; E21B 47/00; E21B 47/026; E21B 49/00; E21B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/04 (2006.01); E21B 47/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/046 (2013.01); E21B 47/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0760419 A2 19970305; EP 0760419 A3 19980603; EP 0760419 B1 20010411; AT 200557 T 20010415; DE 19532605 A1 19970306; ES 2157377 T3 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050807

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030808

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157377

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606745

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200557

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990514

1998-12-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLOWTEX TECHNOLOGIE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980622

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI LU

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI LU