Global Patent Index - EP 0760456 B1

EP 0760456 B1 2000-06-28 - Rotary drum melting furnace

Title (en)

Rotary drum melting furnace

Title (de)

Drehschmelzofen

Title (fr)

Four de fusion tournant

Publication

EP 0760456 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401717 A

Priority

FR 9509462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2181533A1] This rotary melting furnace, where the material to be melted, thrust bycentrifugal forces against the cylindrical wall of the enclosure (1), protects it by an auto-crucible effect from the heat emitted by a central source (6, 46), comprises a unitary enclosure and a common cooling circuit, in principle hollowed out from the shell (2) and flanges (3, 4). Its parts can be connected by external connecting pies (29, 30, 36, 37). Circular, distribution and collecting grooves (58, 59), into which issue fixed ducts (10, 11) ensure a continuous circulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 7/20; F27B 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 7/20 (2006.01); F27B 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 7/38 (2013.01); F27B 7/2083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2737554 A1 19970207; FR 2737554 B1 19970829; CA 2181533 A1 19970204; DE 69609022 D1 20000803; DE 69609022 T2 20010222; EP 0760456 A1 19970305; EP 0760456 B1 20000628; JP H09119778 A 19970506; KR 100436176 B1 20041106; US 5711664 A 19980127

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070801

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609022 20000803

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990908

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970808

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI