Global Patent Index - EP 0760699 B1

EP 0760699 B1 2000-06-21 - WARNING DEVICE FOR BREATHING MASKS

Title (en)

WARNING DEVICE FOR BREATHING MASKS

Title (de)

WARNEINRICHTUNG FÜR ATEM-MASKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT POUR MASQUES RESPIRATOIRES

Publication

EP 0760699 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95915875 A

Priority

  • DE 4418020 A
  • EP 9501400 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4418020A1] The invention relates to a warning device for breathing accessories, especially breathing masks, which can be connected to a breathing gas supply, in which the warning device serves to signal a fault or interruption in the breathing gas supply. Here, the warning device consists of a sound generator (29) responding to gas flow to which gas can be applied via an aperture (23) in the breathing mask (17) via which the inside of the mask can be connected to the environment in the event of a fault or interruption in the supply of breathing gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4418020 A1 19951130; EP 0760699 A1 19970312; EP 0760699 B1 20000621; WO 9532022 A1 19951130

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100413

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100413

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100413

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-08-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2002-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508496

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981109

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960830

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE