Global Patent Index - EP 0761118 B1

EP 0761118 B1 2001-05-30 - Closure for ball chains

Title (en)

Closure for ball chains

Title (de)

Verbindungsschloss für Perlketten

Title (fr)

Fermoir pour chaînes à billes

Publication

EP 0761118 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113716 A

Priority

DE 29514535 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761118A2] The lock consists of a holder sleeve (5) and an insertion sleeve (5'), with the same longitudinal axis. Each sleeve has a jacket (3) with integral head (4). Each sleeve can hold a bead (6) and the internal diameter of the sleeves is larger than the outer bead diameter. The sleeves have inner and outer jacket surfaces with releasably interconnecting profiles. A bore (7) passes through the sleeve head for a thread (8). A slot extends through the sleeve jacket into the bore for insertion of the thread. The sleeves can be disconnected using a set opening force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/20; A44C 5/18; E06B 9/326

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/18 (2006.01); A44C 5/20 (2006.01); E06B 9/326 (2006.01); F16G 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/185 (2013.01); A44C 5/209 (2013.01); E06B 9/326 (2013.01); E06B 2009/3265 (2013.01); E06B 2009/785 (2013.01); Y10S 24/51 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3982 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44034 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45188 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29514535 U1 19951026; AT 201572 T 20010615; EP 0761118 A2 19970312; EP 0761118 A3 19971029; EP 0761118 B1 20010530; JP H09189180 A 19970722; US 5634244 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031013

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MHZ HACHTEL G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606986 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201572 T 20010615

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980225

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL