Global Patent Index - EP 0761131 B1

EP 0761131 B1 2000-05-03 - Device for the adjustable attachment of a drawer front panel to a drawer frame

Title (en)

Device for the adjustable attachment of a drawer front panel to a drawer frame

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur einstellbaren Befestigung der Frontblende einer Schublade an deren Zargen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation réglable pour assembler un panneau frontal au cadre de tiroir

Publication

EP 0761131 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890132 A

Priority

AT 148195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761131A2] Holders (5) on the front plate (2) are provided for each side frame (1), each comprising a support plate (8) fixed to the front one and a pressure plate secured to it by a clamping screw (7). The gap between the plates is adjusted by the screw, and accommodates the frame end, which contains a slot for the screw, the slot extending from the frame end. The slot forms a guide for a protrusion (14) tapped to take the screw. One end of the protrusion extends into the opening (12) for the screw in the support plate. The screw bears against the support plate via its head (17) or a washer (18) between them. Ramp faces (13) can be provided on the support plate so that on tightening the screw the protrusion is pressed against the side of the slot towards the front plate. There can also be an embossed portion (8a) on the plate which is depressed by tightening the screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/956 (2017.01); A47B 2088/952 (2017.01); A47B 2088/953 (2017.01); A47B 2230/0014 (2013.01); Y10S 403/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761131 A2 19970312; EP 0761131 A3 19980729; EP 0761131 B1 20000503; AT 405360 B 19990726; AT A148195 A 19981215; DE 59605107 D1 20000608; ES 2146861 T3 20000816; US 5688033 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100808

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605107

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100807

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090703

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146861 T3

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605107 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT