Global Patent Index - EP 0761139 B1

EP 0761139 B1 2000-03-29 - Supporting device for attaching a lath to a frame

Title (en)

Supporting device for attaching a lath to a frame

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Federlatte eines Lattenrostes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'une latte d'un sommier

Publication

EP 0761139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110034 A

Priority

DE 19528119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761139A1] The device (1) comprises an adaptor for a spring lath (2), a fixing element (4) on the floor grid (3) and a spring element (11) to drive power between the floor grid and the spring lath. The adaptor for the spring lath is built as a holed jacket (8) that is rotatably supported in the fixing element on the lath floor grid. The jacket may be equipped with load-bearing bolts (7) that is rotatable in the floor grid/fixing element transition inside a ball socket (9). The jacket may have a bearing ball that is co-operative with the ball socket of the load-bearing bolts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/068 (2013.01); A47C 23/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19528119 A1 19970206; DE 19528119 C2 20000427; AT 191133 T 20000415; EP 0761139 A1 19970312; EP 0761139 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECTICEL SCHLAFKOMFORT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040503

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604821 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191133 T 20000415

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECTICEL SCHLAFKOMFORT GMBH & CO. KG

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990413

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961203

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL