Global Patent Index - EP 0761145 B1

EP 0761145 B1 2001-05-09 - Improvements in and relating to sleeping bags

Title (en)

Improvements in and relating to sleeping bags

Title (de)

Verbesserungen in oder in Beziehung auf Schlafsäcke

Title (fr)

Améliorations dans ou relatives à des sacs de couchage

Publication

EP 0761145 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306531 A

Priority

GB 9518586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761145A2] A sleeping bag (10) has a top layer (18) and a bottom layer (20), the top layer extending laterally around a greater portion of the perimeter of the bag than the bottom layer. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761145 A2 19970312; EP 0761145 A3 19981202; EP 0761145 B1 20010509; DE 69612710 D1 20010613; DE 69612710 T2 20020207; DK 0761145 T3 20010820; ES 2160771 T3 20011116; GB 2305114 A 19970402; GB 2305114 B 19990818; GB 9518586 D0 19951115; GB 9618594 D0 19961016

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-06 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-04-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2160771 T3

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2001-08-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612710 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL SE

2001-05-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010509

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990513

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL SE

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR LI NL SE