Global Patent Index - EP 0761147 B1

EP 0761147 B1 2001-05-23 - Wire strand fitting

Title (en)

Wire strand fitting

Title (de)

Drahtseil-Garnitur

Title (fr)

Garniture pour câble métallique

Publication

EP 0761147 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113629 A

Priority

AT 143395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761147A1] The curtain is clamped to rings suspended from the rope. At each side of the window (1) and clear of the edge of the latter is an attachment bolt (2) fixed to the wall. The distance-pieces (3) contain drillings or notches accommodating the rope, and are supported on the wall between the bolts and window edges. A clamp (5) between the rope ends forms it into an endless one, and part at least of it is passed through the notches or drillings in the distance-pieces. There can be two runs of rope between the latter, which can be triangular, with their hypotenuses against the wall, the drillings or notches being contained in the apex, or in the side towards the ceiling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761147 A1 19970312; EP 0761147 B1 20010523; AT 403119 B 19971125; AT A143395 A 19970415; DE 59606938 D1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606938 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990419

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI