Global Patent Index - EP 0761153 B1

EP 0761153 B1 2000-02-02 - Device for build-in bath or showertub

Title (en)

Device for build-in bath or showertub

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für den Einbau einer Bade- oder Duschwanne

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour une baignoire ou douche incorporée

Publication

EP 0761153 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114311 A

Priority

DE 19533179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761153A1] The equipment comprises a supporting frame for the bath or basin. It has vertical supporting tubes and feet, while skirt sections forming cladding are secured by clips to the tubes at the side towards the room. A foot (113) forms an extension at each bottom tube end (111), and is adjustable for height from a remote point accessible from the room side, typically by a shaft (117) engaging with the foot via a worm wheel, whose shaft forms a screw thread engaging in a nut fixed to the tube bottom end. Alternatively a flexible shaft can be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761153 A1 19970312; EP 0761153 B1 20000202; AT 189367 T 20000215; DE 19533179 A1 19970313; DE 19533179 C2 19990819; ES 2143117 T3 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-07-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRANZ KALDEWEI G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-09-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-09-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000912

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000908

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20000905

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000811

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000811

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-10 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20000810

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143117 T3

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604356 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI LU

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189367 T 20000215

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981229

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI LU