Global Patent Index - EP 0761193 B1

EP 0761193 B1 2001-12-05 - Absorbent article of pants type

Title (en)

Absorbent article of pants type

Title (de)

Absorbierende, hosenähnliche Windel

Title (fr)

Couche-culotte absorbante

Publication

EP 0761193 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96305695 A

Priority

JP 19773295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761193A2] An absorbent article of pants type comprises a front waist-opening marginal stretchable region (23a) and a front waist stretchable region (24a) having upper, intermediate and lower stretchable subregions (28a,28b,28c). Their elongation stresses stand in a relationship of the front waist-opening marginal stretchable region (23a) > the lower stretchable subregion (28c) > the upper stretchable subregion (28a) > the intermediate stretchable subregion (28b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/49 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/496 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/496 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761193 A2 19970312; EP 0761193 A3 19971001; EP 0761193 B1 20011205; AU 6073196 A 19970206; AU 714939 B2 20000113; CA 2181955 A1 19970203; CA 2181955 C 19990706; DE 69617565 D1 20020117; DE 69617565 T2 20021024; JP 3515834 B2 20040405; JP H0938134 A 19970210; KR 0158550 B1 19981215; SA 1061 B1 20060731; TW 336479 U 19980711; US 5749865 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-08-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160731

2016-08-03 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-08-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69617565

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617565 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000218

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980306

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE