Global Patent Index - EP 0761262 B1

EP 0761262 B1 2000-02-09 - Ski and walking stick

Title (en)

Ski and walking stick

Title (de)

Ski- und Wanderstock

Title (fr)

Canne de ski et de marche

Publication

EP 0761262 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111846 A

Priority

DE 29514223 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761262A1] The pole (1) has a non-circular, mainly triangular, cross-section, which is the same over its complete length, and a longitudinal row of holes in its top section. A locking bolt (9) engages into the holes (14). The bolt is located on the free end of a flexible tongue (10), which is positioned on a freely movable pole grip (4). The free tongue end is connected to a trigger (12), to release it and disconnect the locked connection (9,14). The trigger is ring-shaped. It surrounds the pole with free play, which is larger than the locking path of the bolt. The flexible tongue is positioned in the rear area of the grip, facing the ball of the hand holding the grip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/00 (2006.01); A63C 11/22 (2006.01); A63C 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/00 (2013.01); A63C 11/221 (2013.01); A63C 11/222 (2013.01); A63C 11/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29514223 U1 19951116; AT 189614 T 20000215; EP 0761262 A1 19970312; EP 0761262 B1 20000209

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000723

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604401 20000316

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189614 T 20000215

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970828

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI