Global Patent Index - EP 0761296 B1

EP 0761296 B1 2001-05-16 - Scraping device

Title (en)

Scraping device

Title (de)

Abstreifvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif racleur

Publication

EP 0761296 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113420 A

Priority

DE 19531189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761296A1] The scraper, for wiping material off a surface, is positioned with radial and axial play relative to the surface and is forced onto it purely by the pressure exerted by material acting on inclined surfaces of the scraper, i.e. without auxiliary means such as springs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/18; B01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00241 (2013.01); B01F 7/00208 (2013.01); B01F 7/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531189 A1 19970227; DE 19531189 C2 19990304; EP 0761296 A1 19970312; EP 0761296 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606897

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NETZSCH VAKUMIX GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VAKUMIX RUEHR- UND HOMOGENISIERTECHNIK AG, 28844 WEYHE, DE

- Document: DE 59606897

2015-07-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606897

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100821

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100821

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050821

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606897 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981216

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970903

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI