Global Patent Index - EP 0761322 B1

EP 0761322 B1 2000-12-06 - Method and device for sorting postal items using buffer receptacles at sorting outputs

Title (en)

Method and device for sorting postal items using buffer receptacles at sorting outputs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Poststücken unter Verwendung von Pufferbehältern bei den Sortierausgängen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de tri d'articles de courrier utilisant des réceptacles tampon en sortie de tri

Publication

EP 0761322 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401899 A

Priority

FR 9510549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761322A1] A mail sorting station consists of a closed loop conveyor which moves single articles of mail in trays (3) to a number of final sort receptacles (7) under the direction of a microcomputer which receives information from sensors able to read addresses and measure mail thickness. The final sort receptacles (7) are normally supported on a base which allows them to be easily removed and replaced when full. Buffer receptacles (11) which may be opened and closed automatically are located immediately above them and adjusted in size to the speed of the conveyor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/00 (2006.01); B07C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/06 (2013.01); B07C 3/008 (2013.01); Y10S 209/90 (2013.01); Y10S 209/911 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761322 A1 19970312; EP 0761322 B1 20001206; CA 2185040 A1 19970309; DE 69611128 D1 20010111; DE 69611128 T2 20010517; ES 2153546 T3 20010301; FR 2738506 A1 19970314; FR 2738506 B1 19971017; US 6126017 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLYSTIC

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040906

2005-09-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040905

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOLYSTIC

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040905

2003-10-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SOLYSTIC

2002-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: MANNESMANN DEMATIC POSTAL AUTOMATION S.A. TRANSFER- SOLYSTIC

2002-12-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-13 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153546 T3

2001-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611128 20010111

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN DEMATIC POSTAL AUTOMATION S.A.

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970912

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE