Global Patent Index - EP 0761394 B1

EP 0761394 B1 2000-01-05 - A corner cutter

Title (en)

A corner cutter

Title (de)

Eckschneider

Title (fr)

Découpeuse de coins

Publication

EP 0761394 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107405 A

Priority

JP 25179595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761394A1] A movable blade provided with a circular edge (10) for cutting the corner (102) of the paper (1) and a straight edge (11) for cutting the corner edge (101) is inserted in a movable blade inserting hole provided in the stationary blade, and the corner (102) of the paper (1) inserted in a slit is cut between the stationary edge, and the circular edge (10) and the straight edge (11). Thereby, during the cutting of the corner (102) by the straight edge (11), both of the circular edge (10) and the straight edge (11) cut the corner (102), the corner (102) is cut in the state of being tensioned between the circular edge (10) and the straight edge (11), as if the corner edge (101) is held by the straight edge (11), thereby, the bite of the paper is disappeared to be handled easily and an uneven alignment of the cut corners is diminished. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761394 A1 19970312; EP 0761394 B1 20000105; CN 1144733 A 19970312; DE 69605991 D1 20000210; DE 69605991 T2 20000608; JP 3627073 B2 20050309; JP H0970793 A 19970318; TW 315786 U 19970911

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110509

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100509

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69605991 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980122

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970414

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT