Global Patent Index - EP 0761448 B1

EP 0761448 B1 2002-11-27 - Method of forming an inkjet printhead nozzle structure

Title (en)

Method of forming an inkjet printhead nozzle structure

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bilden einer Düsenstruktur für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Procédé de formation d'une structure de buses pour tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0761448 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306160 A

Priority

US 51990695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761448A2] A composite structure containing a nozzle layer and an adhesive layer is provided and the adhesive layer is coated with a polymeric sacrificial layer. The coated composite structure is laser ablated to form one or more nozzles in the structure and the sacrificial layer is removed. The sacrificial layer is preferably a water soluble polymer and is most preferably polyvinyl alcohol which is removed by directing jets of water at the sacrificial layer until it is substantially removed from the adhesive layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/135 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/162 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761448 A2 19970312; EP 0761448 A3 19971022; EP 0761448 B1 20021127; DE 69625002 D1 20030109; DE 69625002 T2 20030731; JP 3899396 B2 20070328; JP H09118017 A 19970506

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160821

2016-09-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160821

2016-08-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69625002

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FUNAI ELECTRIC CO LTD, JP

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-01-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL INC., GREENWICH, US

- Document: DE 69625002

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-01-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FUNAI ELECTRIC CO., LTD, DAITO CITY, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL INC., GREENWICH, CONN., US

- Document: DE 69625002

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69625002

- Representative's name: ABITZ & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20131107

2014-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69625002

- Representative's name: ABITZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20131107

2013-12-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131128 AND 20131204

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625002 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980404

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB