Global Patent Index - EP 0761469 B1

EP 0761469 B1 2000-11-15 - Stabilised dye-receiving element for use in thermal dye transfer

Title (en)

Stabilised dye-receiving element for use in thermal dye transfer

Title (de)

Stabilisiertes Farbstoffempfangselement zum thermischen Farbstoffübertragungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément récepteurs de colorant stabilisé, utilisé pour le transfert thermique de colorant

Publication

EP 0761469 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202307 A

Priority

  • US 297495 P
  • US 62433196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761469A1] A dye-receiving element for thermal dye transfer comprising a a support having on one side thereof, in order, a subbing layer of an amino-functionalized polymer, and a polymeric dye image-receiving layer, the receiving layer containing a stabilizer having the following structure: <CHEM> wherein n is an integer of 4 to 12, and R is a substituted or unsubstituted alkyl group of at least 6 carbon atoms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40; B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/44 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01); B41M 5/423 (2013.01); B41M 5/443 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761469 A1 19970312; EP 0761469 B1 20001115; DE 69610958 D1 20001221; DE 69610958 T2 20010523; JP H09109562 A 19970428

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610958

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-02-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990924

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970502

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB