Global Patent Index - EP 0761472 B1

EP 0761472 B1 2000-03-15 - Gathering and stitching machine

Title (en)

Gathering and stitching machine

Title (de)

Sammelhefter

Title (fr)

Assembleuse et brocheuse combinée

Publication

EP 0761472 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810581 A

Priority

CH 255295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761472A1] The stapler (1) is for making magazines etc. from folded printed sheets (5). It consists of a section of conveyor (2), along which a collector (3) with printed sheets is moved. The stapling point (7), which connects up with the collectors, has several stapling devices (9), synchronised with each other. One of these stapling devices may oscillate along the stapling point. During the stapling process, in moves in the same direction as that in which the printed products are being conveyed. There may be stapling points for several different types of printed product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/00 (2006.01); B42B 9/04 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

"Der Sammelhefter 300 - Flexibilität im Hochleistungsbereich"; Müller Martini Marketing AG.; März 1995

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761472 A1 19970312; EP 0761472 B1 20000315; CH 691229 A5 20010531; DE 59604653 D1 20000420; JP 3892918 B2 20070314; JP H09109572 A 19970428; US 5772195 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160903

2016-09-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160903

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604653

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980813

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970808

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT