Global patent index - EP 0761539 B1

EP 0761539 B1 2001-03-07 - Machine for transferring packages

Title (en)

Machine for transferring packages

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Packungen

Title (fr)

Installation pour transférer des emballages

Publication

EP 0761539 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112395 A

Priority

DE 19532092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761539A1] The packs (10) or their pockets (16) are moved in an arc in an axial direction, the packs moving axially on the rim of a continuously rotating turret (15) so that the packs once inserted in their tangentially open packs (16) move helically along a semicircular path. The turret (15) is placed axi-parallel between a vertically rotating folding turret and a drying turret (12) also rotating in the vertical plane in such a way that the paths (13,14) of turret (11) and turret (12) contact the path followed by the packs (10) at their transfer to the transfer turret (15). Turret (15) pockets (16) are fixed to axi-parallel reciprocating bars (28) which in turn rotate with the pack (10) axially round a central turret axis. The axi-parallel movement of the packs and pockets derives from a fixed cam groove or control groove as travelled, as the turret (15) rotates, by feeler rollers connected to pocket (16) or bar (28). The bars themselves are held movably in a common holding body which is fitted to the turret shaft (33) so as to rotate with the turret (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/22; B65B 61/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/00 (2006.01); B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 35/08 (2006.01); B65B 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/226 (2013.01); B65B 61/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19532092 A1 19970306; BR 9603615 A 19980519; CN 1071235 C 20010919; CN 1148020 A 19970423; EP 0761539 A1 19970312; EP 0761539 B1 20010307; JP 2891943 B2 19990517; JP H09165007 A 19970624; US 5758468 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status

2014-06-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-12

2001-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970205

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT