Global Patent Index - EP 0761543 B1

EP 0761543 B1 2000-11-29 - Method for checking the atmosphere inside containers sealed with a lid

Title (en)

Method for checking the atmosphere inside containers sealed with a lid

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Kontrollieren der Atmosphäre von mit einem Deckel versiegelten Behältern

Title (fr)

Procédé de contrôle d'atmosphère de pots scellés par un opercule

Publication

EP 0761543 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401791 A

Priority

FR 9510203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761543A1] The procedure consists of attaching each seal lid to the periphery (3) of a group of pots, the centre of each lid having an aperture (17) which can be connected, for example, to a suction unit or other atmosphere control system. Once the atmosphere inside the whole group of pots has been controlled, the lid is applied and sealed to the individual pot's edges. Each of the apertures (17) is situated at a point where four adjacent pots meet, and the atmosphere inside the pots is controlled by attaching a valve (5) to the lid's aperture. Once each group of pots has been sealed it can be cut to divide it into smaller groups or individual pots.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 31/04; B65B 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/04 (2006.01); B65B 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/08 (2013.01); B65B 31/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761543 A1 19970312; EP 0761543 B1 20001129; DE 69611069 D1 20010104; DE 69611069 T2 20010719; ES 2153545 T3 20010301; FR 2738216 A1 19970307; FR 2738216 B1 19971114

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090815

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090817

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153545 T3

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611069 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2000-11-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECQUART, PATRICK

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CHECKING THE ATMOSPHERE INSIDE CONTAINERS SEALED WITH A LID

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990520

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR