Global Patent Index - EP 0761558 B1

EP 0761558 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for closing a container and dispensing the product contained in it

Title (en)

Device for closing a container and dispensing the product contained in it

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen eines Behälters und zur Abgabe des Behälterinhalts

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bouchage d'un récipient et de distribution du produit qu'il contient

Publication

EP 0761558 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420270 A

Priority

FR 9509900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761558A1] The container/dispenser has a cover (2) fixed to the neck (3) of the container, made with a skirt (5) which fastens to the outer wall of the container or its neck, and a central duct (8) which is connected to the skirt by an intermediate element (9). The intermediate element has an eccentric aperture (10) which is connected to the central duct via an oblique channel (13). A cap (4) which fits over the cover and is able to rotate about its lengthwise axis (12) has an outer skirt (18) and a central tube (23) which engages with the cover's duct (8), the skirt and tube being connected by a top (25) with an outlet (26) in it connecting with the eccentric aperture in the cover. The tube (23) inside the cap has an aperture (24) in its side wall linking the central duct in the cover to the oblique channel (13). The outlet in the cap is opened and closed by rotating it relative to the inner cover. The cover and cap can each be made in one piece from a moulded synthetic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/26; B65D 101/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/265 (2013.01); B65D 47/263 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2737706 A1 19970214; FR 2737706 B1 19971010; DE 69607800 D1 20000525; DE 69607800 T2 20001228; EP 0761558 A1 19970312; EP 0761558 B1 20000419; ES 2145412 T3 20000701; US 5785213 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070809

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070810

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070810

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETS *JANVIER

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060809

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060809

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050805

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145412 T3

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607800 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990625

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970705

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT