Global patent index - EP 0761858 B1

EP 0761858 B1 2000-06-28 - Needle unit for knitting machine

Title (en)

Needle unit for knitting machine

Title (de)

Nadeleinheit für Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'aiguille pour métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 0761858 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96113498 A

Priority

  • JP 22994695 A
  • JP 18495696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761858A1] A needle unit which is changeable in movement and which is free of friction loss while the needle body is moving up and down. It has a select jack (1), a push-up jack (2) and a needle body (3) arranged in a needle groove in this order from bottom to top. The needle body (3) has at its bottom a bifurcated portion made up of a support piece (9) and a resilient piece (10). The push-up jack (2) has its top end slidably inserted between the support piece (9) and the resilient piece (10), with the resilient piece (10) biased toward the push-up jack (2). The resilient piece is provided in its inner surface with two recesses (11,12) having different depths and on its outer surface with a butt (14). The push-up jack has a protrusion (8) on one side thereof adapted to engage in the recesses when the push-up jack slides up and down. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/10 (2006.01); D04B 15/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/68 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3523989 C1 19870102 - SCHIEBER UNIVERSAL MASCHF

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761858 A1 19970312; EP 0761858 B1 20000628; CN 1062042 C 20010214; CN 1153836 A 19970709; DE 69609024 D1 20000803; DE 69609024 T2 20010308; ES 2149410 T3 20001101; JP 2747280 B2 19980506; JP H09132842 A 19970520; KR 100244077 B1 20000401; TW 312245 U 19970801

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030912

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-04-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-10-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-08-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149410

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609024

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991116

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970827

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT