Global Patent Index - EP 0761911 B1

EP 0761911 B1 2000-04-05 - Security barrier element allowing the controlled crossing of the barrier

Title (en)

Security barrier element allowing the controlled crossing of the barrier

Title (de)

Sicherheits-Sperrvorrichtungsbauteil für den kontrollierten Durchgang durch die Sperrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Elément de barrière de type barrière de sécurité permettant le franchissement contrôlé de la barrière

Publication

EP 0761911 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420285 A

Priority

FR 9510457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761911A1] The barrier consists of a series of sections (2) with vertical bars (4) and upright ends (3a) with fixings (6) for joining to adjacent sections. A gateway (1) which can be fitted between two adjacent barrier sections, has uprights (10a) which extend upwards to a height sufficient for a person to pass through, and an opening gate (20). The uprights (10a) are joined by a cross-member (12), with a panel (13) between it and a top bar to carry information. The lower sections of the gateway uprights have legs (25) to support the gateway in a vertical position and having folding spacer rods (26) at their lower ends. A latch on one side of the gate can be fixed with the aid of a lock such as a padlock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 11/02; E01F 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/02 (2006.01); E05B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/022 (2013.01); E05B 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761911 A1 19970312; EP 0761911 B1 20000405; DE 69607542 D1 20000511; FR 2738279 A1 19970307; FR 2738279 B1 19971114

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607542 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT