Global patent index - EP 0761920 B1

EP 0761920 B1 2000-01-05 - Window/door with pivot and/or tilting fitting

Title (en)

Window/door with pivot and/or tilting fitting

Title (de)

Fenster/Tür mit Dreh-Kipp-Beschlag

Title (fr)

Fenêtre/porte avec battant pivotant et/ou basculant

Publication

EP 0761920 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112699 A

Priority

DE 29513098 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761920A2] A window or door with pivot or tilt mechanism has locking elements, at least one of which has an entry slot (25) which is rigidly connected to the control rod (8) of the fitting (6) and operates in the tilted and locked positions. A mushroom bolt (9) aligned to this locking element, is also rigidly located at this point. This locking element is attached to the cover slide (7) of the fitting at least over the length of the entry slot, and is also fixed to the control rod. The control rod and the cover slide are located on a securing plate (13) behind the fitting groove (5) and against the door or window frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/06; E05C 9/18; E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05D 15/522 (2006.01); E05D 15/526 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05D 15/526 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05D 15/522 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29513098 U1 19961219; AT 188530 T 20000115; DK 0761920 T3 20000529; EP 0761920 A2 19970312; EP 0761920 A3 19970820; EP 0761920 B1 20000105; EP 0761920 B2 20050518

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2006-07-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050807

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040807

2003-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031013

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-08-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030825

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-04-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20001004

2003-04-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG.

- Effective date: 20000925

2002-04-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-04-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Document Number: 96112699.2

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-08-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-08-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-07-25 [29U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-07-25 [29W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20011116

2000-11-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUECO INTERNATIONAL KG

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-11-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000809

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-08-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-08-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-05-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000307

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188530

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981123

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971111

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE