Global Patent Index - EP 0761977 B1

EP 0761977 B1 2001-01-17 - High temperature composite material impellor, particularly of small diameter, and its manufacturing method

Title (en)

High temperature composite material impellor, particularly of small diameter, and its manufacturing method

Title (de)

Rotor aus hochtemperaturbeständige Verbundwerkstoff, insbesondere mit kleinem Diameter und sein Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Turbine en matériau composite thermostructural, en particulier à petit diamètre, et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0761977 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401835 A

Priority

FR 9510205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0761977A1] The turbine (10) consists of a number of blades (22) disposed between two flanges (24,30), the blades and the flanges being made out of a composite material of a carbon fibre in a matrix of carbon or ceramic. The first piece (20) is made as a single mono-bloc piece from a composite material forming the first flange (24) and the blades (22). It is first consolidated in a mould and then machined. The second piece forming the second flange (30) is machined from a composite material formed in a mould and consolidated. The two parts (20,30) are then assembled with the blades (22) in contact with the second flange (30) and clamped up centrally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/02; F01D 5/34; F04D 29/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 1/06 (2006.01); F01D 5/04 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01); F01D 5/34 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/282 (2013.01); F01D 5/04 (2013.01); F01D 5/34 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/284 (2013.01); F05D 2230/53 (2013.01); F05D 2300/20 (2013.01); F05D 2300/224 (2013.01); F05D 2300/6033 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49318 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49321 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0761977 A1 19970312; EP 0761977 B1 20010117; DE 69611582 D1 20010222; DE 69611582 T2 20010823; ES 2155178 T3 20010501; FR 2738303 A1 19970307; FR 2738303 B1 19971128; JP 3484299 B2 20040106; JP H09125901 A 19970513; RU 2141564 C1 19991120; US 5775878 A 19980707; US 6029347 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050829

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050828

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-08-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050828

2005-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050828

2004-08-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040723

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155178

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611582

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990510

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970505

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT