Global Patent Index - EP 0762068 B1

EP 0762068 B1 2000-11-22 - Process for operating an oxygen-consuming metallurgical shaft furnace

Title (en)

Process for operating an oxygen-consuming metallurgical shaft furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Sauerstoff-verzehrenden metallurgischen Schachtofens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'opération d'un four à cuve métallurgique utilisant l'oxygène comme comburant

Publication

EP 0762068 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112619 A

Priority

  • DE 19531604 A
  • DE 19622695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762068A1] In a method of operating an oxygen-consuming metallurgical shaft furnace, esp. a cast iron-producing cupola furnace, the oxygen-contg. gas mixt. (blast) is introduced by one or more injector nozzles, pref. in the blast zone region of the shaft, the conveyed medium being oxygen opt. mixed with other gases, pref. a mixt. of oxygen and air with a nitrogen content of 0-80 vol.%. Also claimed is a shaft furnace (esp. a cupola furnace) for cast iron prodn., having one or more injector nozzles for supplying the oxygen-contg. gas mixt. and opt. other gases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 1/16; C21B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 11/02 (2006.01); F27B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 1/16 (2013.01); C21B 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Firmenprospekt: Linde-HIGHJET-Verfahren

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762068 A1 19970312; EP 0762068 B1 20001122; AT 197734 T 20001215; CZ 292393 B6 20030917; CZ 9602243 A3 19970312; ES 2153924 T3 20010316; HU 9602352 A2 19980428; HU 9602352 A3 19990301; HU 9602352 D0 19961028; PL 183679 B1 20020628; PL 315238 A1 19970303

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080805

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070805

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070813

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070802

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060802

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-07-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 04/2001 PAGE 426: CORR.: LINDE GAS AG.

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153924 T3

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-02-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606154 20001228

2000-12-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197734 T 20001215

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR OPERATING AN OXYGEN-CONSUMING METALLURGICAL SHAFT FURNACE

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR OPERATING AN OXYGEN-CONSUMING METALLURGICAL SHAFT FURNACE AND SHAFT FURNACE

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

1997-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970415

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL