Global patent index - EP 0762070 B1

EP 0762070 B1 2001-02-28 - Refrigerant tubes for heat exchangers

Title (en)

Refrigerant tubes for heat exchangers

Title (de)

Kühlrohre für Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Tubes de refroidissement pour échangeurs de chaleur

Publication

EP 0762070 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96110844 A

Priority

JP 17200795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762070A1] A refrigerant tube (T1) for use in heat exchangers comprises a flat tube (7) having parallel refrigerant passages (6) in its interior and comprising upper (1) and lower (2) walls and a plurality of reinforcing walls (5) connected between the upper and lower walls, the reinforcing walls extending longitudinally of the tube and spaced apart from one another by a predetermined distance. The reinforcing walls are each formed with a plurality of communication holes (8) for causing the parallel refrigerant passages to communicate with one another therethrough. Each of the reinforcing walls is 10 to 40% in opening ratio which is the proportion of all the communication holes in the reinforcing wall to the reinforcing wall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/40; F28D 1/03; F28F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/02 (2006.01); B21C 23/10 (2006.01); B21C 37/15 (2006.01); F25B 39/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/048 (2013.01); B21C 23/10 (2013.01); B21C 37/151 (2013.01); F28D 1/0316 (2013.01); F28D 1/0391 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0071 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762070 A1 19970312; EP 0762070 B1 20010228; AR 002691 A1 19980325; AT 199456 T 20010315; AU 5834496 A 19970123; AU 711980 B2 19991028; BR 9602985 A 19980428; CA 2180598 A1 19970108; CA 2180598 C 20070605; CN 1111717 C 20030618; CN 1140828 A 19970122; CZ 293383 B6 20040414; CZ 9602008 A3 19970416; DE 69611868 D1 20010405; DE 69611868 T2 20010613; ES 2154366 T3 20010401; IN 188905 B 20021116; JP H0926278 A 19970128; KR 100414852 B1 20040331; MX 9602646 A 19970628; MY 119070 A 20050331; TW 296425 B 19970121; ZA 9605732 B 19970123

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070704

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2003-07-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-07-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611868

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154366

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199456

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990318

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970626

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE