Global Patent Index - EP 0762337 A3

EP 0762337 A3 2000-01-19 - Method and device for enhancing manipulation-proof of critical data

Title (en)

Method and device for enhancing manipulation-proof of critical data

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Erhöhung der Manipulationssicherheit von kritischen Daten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour augmenter la protection contre la manipulation de données critiques

Publication

EP 0762337 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96250191 A

Priority

  • DE 19534527 A
  • DE 19534529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762337A2] The control unit (6) has a microprocessor or an OTP (one-time programmable) processor that has, in addition to CPU (6a), other units in common housing, forming the OTP ROM (6b), and OTP ROM (6c) and acting as a security unit against unauthorised manipulation. The first non-volatile memory (NVM 20) is an EEPROM, serving as a second line of defence against manipulation. There is also an external non-volatile memory (NUM 25) acting in the same way connected to the processor (6) through an input/output control module (4), particularly against taking information out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00411 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762337 A2 19970312; EP 0762337 A3 20000119; US 5771348 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI