Global Patent Index - EP 0762354 B1

EP 0762354 B1 2000-11-15 - Elongated bodies as security label for electromagnetic theft security systems

Title (en)

Elongated bodies as security label for electromagnetic theft security systems

Title (de)

Längsgestreckter Körper als Sicherungsetikett für elektromagnetische Diebstahlsicherungssysteme

Title (fr)

Corps allongés comme étiquette de sécurité pour des systèmes électromagnétiques antivol

Publication

EP 0762354 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113005 A

Priority

DE 19533362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762354A1] In the heat treatment, the amorphous strip or tape is supplied from the spool (1) to the tensioning roller (2), going between the roller pair (3) connected by the line (4) with a current source (5). The strip (6) then passes into the oven (7), but is surrounded by a screening tube (8) of conducting or soft-magnetic material shielding the strip from external fields. Inside the tube there is a coil (9) connected to a voltage source (10), producing a longitudinal field on the strip. After the oven, the strip passes through a second roller pair (11) that returns current to source of maintains tension and then is wound round another spool (12) for cutting into short pieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; H01F 1/153

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 45/04 (2006.01); G08B 13/24 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01); H01F 3/04 (2006.01); H01F 13/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2411 (2013.01); G08B 13/244 (2013.01); G08B 13/2442 (2013.01); H01F 1/15333 (2013.01); H01F 1/15391 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762354 A1 19970312; EP 0762354 B1 20001115; DE 19533362 A1 19970313; DK 0762354 T3 20010205; ES 2152463 T3 20010201; JP H09148117 A 19970606; US 5757272 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2007-03-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-02-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152463

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2000-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991004

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970404

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL SE