EP 0762365 A1 19970312 - Adhesive label
Title (en)
Adhesive label
Title (de)
Haftetikett
Title (fr)
Etiquette adhésive
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 29513170 U 19950816
Abstract (en)
An imprint is visible from the upper side under the cover layer and there is an adhesive layer under the imprint. The adhesive label (1) has overlapping first end sections (19) and second edge sections (17) extending over the end surfaces (51) of the battery along a production line of the peripheral surface of the battery (50). The end sections locate on the end surfaces as a result of shrinkage of the cover layer. The imprint is fitted directly on the underside of the cover layer. A layer covering over the imprint and the part surfaces of the cover layer free from the imprint carries the adhesive layer on its underside.
Abstract (de)
Ein Haftetikett zum Aufbringen auf eine Umfangsfläche einer eine Achse und Deck- und Bodenendflächen (51, 51) aufweisenden Trockenzellenbatterie (50) umfaßt: eine gereckte, schrumpfbare, transparente Deckfolie mit einer Oberseite und einer Unterseite, einen unter der Deckfolie befindlichen, von der Oberseite her sichtbaren Aufdruck und eine unter dem Aufdruck befindliche Haftkleberschicht, wobei das Haftetikett (1) längs einer Erzeugungslinie der Umfangsfläche der Batterie (50) überlappend aufeinanderlegbare erste Randabschnitte (19, 19) und über die Endflächen (51, 51) der Batterie ragende zweite Randabschnitte (17, 17) aufweist, die durch Schrumpfen der Deckfolie auf den Endflächen (51, 51) aufliegen, wobei der Aufdruck unmittelbar auf die Unterseite der Deckfolie aufgebracht ist. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G09F 3/04 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G09F 3/10 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24868 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/2848 (2015.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] FR 2674979 A1 19921009 - ROTANOTICE SA [FR]
- [A] EP 0129850 A2 19850102 - ZWECKFORM WERK [DE] & DE 3322309 A1 19850103 - ZWECKFORM WERK [DE]
- [A] WO 9419835 A1 19940901 - DURACELL INC [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 20 (E - 575) 21 January 1988 (1988-01-21)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 218 (E - 761) 22 May 1989 (1989-05-22)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 425 (E - 681) 10 November 1988 (1988-11-10)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 6248427 B1 20010619; AT E194246 T1 20000715; AT E215721 T1 20020415; CA 2183593 A1 19970217; CA 2183593 C 20000328; CN 1107299 C 20030430; CN 1151059 A 19970604; DE 29513170 U1 19970102; DE 59605489 D1 20000803; DE 59609038 D1 20020508; DK 0762365 T3 20001030; DK 0947971 T3 20020708; EA 000086 B1 19980625; EA 199600054 A1 19970331; EP 0762365 A1 19970312; EP 0762365 B1 20000628; EP 0947971 A2 19991006; EP 0947971 A3 19991110; EP 0947971 B1 20020403; HK 1009302 A1 19990528; HK 1020634 A1 20000512; JP 2869963 B2 19990310; JP H10301496 A 19981113
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 69457296 A 19960809; AT 96113097 T 19960814; AT 99113150 T 19960814; CA 2183593 A 19960815; CN 96111657 A 19960812; DE 29513170 U 19950816; DE 59605489 T 19960814; DE 59609038 T 19960814; DK 96113097 T 19960814; DK 99113150 T 19960814; EA 199600054 A 19960815; EP 96113097 A 19960814; EP 99113150 A 19960814; HK 98109901 A 19980813; HK 99105125 A 19980813; JP 23367796 A 19960816