Global Patent Index - EP 0762365 B1

EP 0762365 B1 2000-06-28 - Adhesive label

Title (en)

Adhesive label

Title (de)

Haftetikett

Title (fr)

Etiquette adhésive

Publication

EP 0762365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113097 A

Priority

DE 29513170 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2183593C] An adhesive label (1)for application upon a circumferential surface (50) of a dry cell battery having an axis and end surfaces (51,51) includes: a stretched, shrinkable, transparent cover foil (3) with a top side and a bottom side, an imprint (5) located beneath the cover foil (3) on its bottom side is visible from the top side. A contact adhesive layer (13) is located beneath the imprint (5). The adhesive label (1) further comprises first edge segments (19,19) along a generatrix line of the circumferential surface of the battery (50) which can be superimposed in an overlapping manner and second edge segments (17, 17) projecting axially beyond the end surfaces (51, 51) of the battery, which end segments (17, 17) rest upon the end surfaces (51, 51) by shrinkage of the cover foil (3). The imprint (5) is applied directly upon the bottom side of the cover foil (3). A metal layer (7), non-metal layer (9), a combination thereof (11) or flexible barrier layer (21, 21a, 21b, 22) between the imprint (5) and contact adhesive layer (13) prevents migration of solvent, from the contact adhesive layer (13), and electrolyte, from residues on the surface of the battery, into the imprint (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/04 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24868 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2848 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29513170 U1 19970102; AT 194246 T 20000715; AT 215721 T 20020415; CA 2183593 A1 19970217; CA 2183593 C 20000328; CN 1107299 C 20030430; CN 1151059 A 19970604; DK 0762365 T3 20001030; DK 0947971 T3 20020708; EA 000086 B1 19980625; EA 199600054 A1 19970731; EP 0762365 A1 19970312; EP 0762365 B1 20000628; EP 0947971 A2 19991006; EP 0947971 A3 19991110; EP 0947971 B1 20020403; HK 1009302 A1 20001103; HK 1020634 A1 20020705; JP 2869963 B2 19990310; JP H10301496 A 19981113; US 6248427 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605489

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120815

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194246 T

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-03-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CCL BATTERY LABEL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CCL LABEL MEERANE GMBH

- Free text: CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH#BRUECKENWEG 5#08393 MEERANE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CCL LABEL MEERANE GMBH#BRUECKENWEG 5#08393 MEERANE (DE)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH

- Free text: CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH#BRUECKENWEG 5#08393 MEERANE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH#BRUECKENWEG 5#08393 MEERANE (DE)

2006-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH

2005-12-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-12-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH

- Free text: STEINBEIS IBL GMBH#ROSENHEIMER STRASSE 51#83098 BRANNENBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CCL BATTERY LABEL GMBH#BRUECKENWEG 5#08393 MEERANE (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605489 20000803

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194246 T 20000715

1999-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AST, HANS-PETER

1999-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINBEIS IBL GMBH

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980903

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970904

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE