Global Patent Index - EP 0762433 B1

EP 0762433 B1 2000-05-17 - Protective screen wall

Title (en)

Protective screen wall

Title (de)

Schutzschirmwand

Title (fr)

Mur écran protecteur

Publication

EP 0762433 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202322 A

Priority

NL 1001051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762433A1] Protective screen wall consisting of a laminated construction with at least two external wall parts (7,8) and a sheet of radiation-inhibiting material (9) placed between them. In order to combine the protective screen panels to form a protective screen wall, it is proposed that each panel should be provided with connecting means (13,14) at at least one edge. In addition, in order to prevent radiation from passing between the boundary of two panels, housings are provided, for receiving an edge part of radiation-inhibiting material, which is in the form of a T-section (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 1/12 (2006.01); G21F 3/00 (2006.01); G21F 3/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 3/04 (2013.01); G21F 1/12 (2013.01); G21F 3/00 (2013.01); E04B 2001/925 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/301 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/304 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/301 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762433 A1 19970312; EP 0762433 B1 20000517; AT 193146 T 20000615; DE 69608382 D1 20000621; DE 69608382 T2 20010104; NL 1001051 C2 19970225

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTOS INTERIEURMAKERS B.V.

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2001-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010822

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608382 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193146 T 20000615

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980825

1997-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970710

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE