Global Patent Index - EP 0762434 B1

EP 0762434 B1 2003-06-04 - Apparatus useful as an electrical insulation

Title (en)

Apparatus useful as an electrical insulation

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur elektrischen Isolierung

Title (fr)

Dispositif apte à l'isolation électrique

Publication

EP 0762434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113144 A

Priority

IT MI951797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762434A2] Body (2) of insulating material, such as synthetic resin includes a screen (3) of epoxy resin enriched with soot particles to make it electrically conductive. Pref. both the body and the screen are of epoxy resin and the screen is made by a casting/pressing process, being a cylindrical tubular body (4) with truncated cone end parts (5). The screen body may include blind holes (6) to allow insertion of positioning devices. Screen pref. comprises 100 pts. epoxy resin; 20 pts. soot; 80 pts. hardener; 0.8 pts. reaction accelerator; and 270 pts. filler and bonding agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 3/40; C08K 3/04; C08L 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 1/24 (2006.01); H01B 3/40 (2006.01); H01B 17/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/40 (2013.01); H01B 1/24 (2013.01); H01B 17/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762434 A2 19970312; EP 0762434 A3 19980401; EP 0762434 B1 20030604; DE 59610492 D1 20030710; ES 2200024 T3 20040301; IT 1277490 B1 19971110; IT MI951797 A1 19970224; IT MI951797 D0 19950824

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100817

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59610492

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100816

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200024 T3

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610492 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BELLON, EDUARDO,C/O ABB RICERCA S.P.A.

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CAPITANIO, ROBERTO,C/O ABB RICERCA S.P.A.

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRONGILLO, ALESSIO,C/O ABB RICERCA S.P.A.

2003-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GIACOMUCCI, ANTONIO,C/O ABB RICERCA S.P.A.

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980720

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT;LV;SI