Global Patent Index - EP 0762529 B1

EP 0762529 B1 2001-03-14 - Iris polarizer for an antenna primary source

Title (en)

Iris polarizer for an antenna primary source

Title (de)

Iris-Polarisator für Antennenprimärstrahler

Title (fr)

Polariseur à iris pour source primaire d'antenne

Publication

EP 0762529 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401830 A

Priority

FR 9510299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762529A1] The polariser includes a waveguide section (3) with a series of inwardly projecting variable irises. The irises are regularly spaced and are actuated by inductive or capacitive components according to the direction of the linear polarisation of an electric field. The irises can produce a differential phase shift of 90 degrees on two orthogonal components of the electric field to obtain a circularly polarised wave. Pairs of adjusting screws (30,31) are used to optimise the polariser without having to change the dimensions of the guide. The adjusting screws are in the median plane (P) of the irises and in the orthogonal plane (P').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/173 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762529 A1 19970312; EP 0762529 B1 20010314; DE 69612052 D1 20010419; DE 69612052 T2 20010920; FR 2738400 A1 19970307; FR 2738400 B1 19971003

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050827

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-12-02 [REG FR AU] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

2005-12-02 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2005-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2005-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2004-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THALES

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612052 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991129

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT