Global Patent Index - EP 0762531 B1

EP 0762531 B1 2001-04-04 - A wire antenna for a machine

Title (en)

A wire antenna for a machine

Title (de)

Drahtantenne für eine Maschine

Title (fr)

Antenne filaire pour engin

Publication

EP 0762531 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401759 A

Priority

FR 9510643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762531A2] The wire antenna (13) is mounted inside the upper part of a wing like section (2S) with good aerodynamic properties. The section is mounted in a slot (41) with a holder (42). The holder is fitted to the aircraft engine. The section holding the antenna can protrude from the slot at an angle of 60 degrees or it can be retracted by section rotation, with the wire antenna bent and forming a conformal surface with the slot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/285 (2013.01); H01Q 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762531 A2 19970312; EP 0762531 A3 19970319; EP 0762531 B1 20010404; DE 69612343 D1 20010510; DE 69612343 T2 20010906; FR 2738674 A1 19970314; FR 2738674 B1 19971205

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080808

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612343 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961001

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL